Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fleetmatics Usa Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Pappanastos, John Nick, against Albritton Farms Inc, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Shonna Young Gay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShonna Young Gay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER: TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 11/22/2016 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge SHONNA GAY presiding. | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Reopened for Civil Other on 11/16/2016 | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 11/22/16, 9:30AM | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Case 322016CA000178CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/25/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.