Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beloat, Stanley R Jr, filed a(n) Other case represented by Nordby, Daniel Elden, against Jackson County Canvassing Boar, Stephens, Sylvia D, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Elijah Smiley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElijah Smiley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2016 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF QUO WARRANTO | |
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 26, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF QUO WARRANTO | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RECUSAL | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATED FACTS | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number CA 2016001784 | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $400.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/26/2016 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ELIJAH SMILEY presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.