Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mitchell, Joshua, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Terra Com Environmental Consul, represented by Larkin, Robert Edward, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, WILLIAM LEON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, WILLIAM LEON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Robert E Larkin ESQ Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER | |
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
June 23, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $410.00 Receipt Number CA 2016000966 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.