Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Carter, Earl Junior, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Booth, John Edgar, against State Farm Mutual Automobile I, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 02, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL MEDIATION REPORT - ALL ISSUES RESOLVED | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION | |
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.