Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dannels, Justin, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Rotstein, Jonathan Isaac, against Family Dollar Services Inc, represented by Puritz, Steven Michael, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING SIGNED BY JUDGE | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 6/21/2018 at 1030 AM, MX - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 6/21/18 AT 10:30AM | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ATTEND THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 21, 2018 VIA TELEPHONE | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUATION OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION | |
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.51 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.