Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kexel, Christine, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Humphries, Kevin Grady, against Loves Travel Stops And Country, represented by Cole, Frank Harris, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2016 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
May 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE NONPARTY SUBPOENAS DUCES TECUM | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES I | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, LOVE'S TRAVEL STOPS & COUNTRY STORES, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.