Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cadet, Kerby, filed a(n) Other case against Jones, Sec Of Doc, Julie L, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 18, 2015 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Event INACTIVITY scheduled on 3/29/2017 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MICHAEL MILLER presiding. | |
March 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge: MILLER , MICHAEL D Assigned | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INACTIVITY FOR TEN MONTHS AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REVIEW OF INDIGENT PRISONERS CIVIL CLAIM | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | PETITIONER FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS | |
November 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case 322015CA000761CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 11/18/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.