Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kessing, Glenn A, filed a(n) Other case against Jones, Secretary Fl Doc, Et. A, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 04, 2015 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DEFENDANT CHANGING ADDRESS | |
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR FILE | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | TRANSFER LETTER TO LEON COUNTY | |
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENTS MOTIONS TO VACATE ORDER AND TRANSFER ACTION TO PROPER VENUE OR ALTERNATIVELY PROVIDE AN EXTENSION OF TIME | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING RESPONDENT'S MOTIONS TO VACATE ORDER AND TRANSFER ACTION TO PROPER VENUE OR ALTERNATIVELY PROVIDE AN EXTENSION OF TIME - BEFORE RECORDING | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE ORDER, AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE LEON COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT OR ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE PAMELA BONDI AND ERIK KVERNE | |
November 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Pamela Jo Bondi Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TO RESPOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.