Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Myles, Brown, Deborah, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Green, J. Marcus, against Lockwood Construction Company, Lockwood, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with WRIGHT, WILLIAM LEON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWRIGHT, WILLIAM LEON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT | |
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT - BEFORE RECORDING | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO COUNTY COURT | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE'S OFFICE ADVISED THIS WAS FILED IN THE WRONG COURT | |
January 29, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNT OWED AND COSTS | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | PRAECIPE FOR DEFAULT: DEFAULT ENTERED | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING :RETURN OF SERVICE 10/6/15 RICHARD LOCKWOOD DBA LOCKWOOD CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING : RETURN OF SERVICE-RICHARD LOCKWOOD 10/6/15 | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.