Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bowden, Devin O, filed a(n) Other - Non Fee case against Silcox, Michael, Barfield, John, Fl Doc, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2015 |
CategoryOther - Non Fee |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2016 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER DENYING PETITIONER INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DISMISSING PETITION FOR PROTECTION AND RESTRAINING ORDER FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PETITIONER INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DISMISSING PETITION FOR PROTECTION AND RESTRAINING ORDER FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES - BEFORE RECORDING | |
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 09, 2015 | Docket Event | LIMITED APPEARANCE AND RESPONSE TO ORDER TO RESPOND BY THE FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S ADDITIONAL RESPONSE | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL INFORMATION TO THE COURT | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | SENT TO LAW CLERK FOR REVIEW | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DEVIN BOWDEN | |
September 09, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS TO RESPOND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.