Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jpa Investments Llc, filed a(n) Other case represented by Milton, A Clay, against The Sarah Jo Shirley Family Tr, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with William L. Wright presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam L. Wright Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 15, 2015 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 10/28/2015 at 0930 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WRIGHT presiding. | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10/28/15 9:30 AM CST | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFAULT (BLANK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.