Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Watson, Lois A, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Goldberg, Stuart Elliot, against Kelson Drug Inc, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 01, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES | |
June 22, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES TO FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
April 23, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.