Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gehron, Candace, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Thompson, Robert Waylon, against Florida Association Of Countie, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with William L. Wright presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam L. Wright Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 2015 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 03, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER | |
August 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Judge: WRIGHT , WILLIAM L Assigned | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 8/11/2015 at 1015 AM, MX - Judge WILLIAM WRIGHT presiding. | |
July 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING CLAIM FOR PAST MEDICAL EXPENSES | |
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES | |
July 02, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE PLAINTIFF, CANDACE GEHRON'S, NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.