Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hannah, Lea, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Chr International Inc, A Fl Co, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GAY, SHONNA YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGAY, SHONNA YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2015 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedFebruary 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NEED $10.00 TO RECORD SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING: SATISFACTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT AGAINST FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA | |
August 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
August 06, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT (SENT TO RECORDING) | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
July 29, 2015 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT - BEFORE RECORDING | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT | |
July 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF GARNISHMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.