Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxx, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Dtreds Llc, represented by Findley, Thomas Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with WADE MERCER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWADE MERCER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
This complaint is filed by xxxxxxxxxxxxxxx against DTREDS, LLC. The action is brought under Chapter 760, Florida Statutes; 42 U.S.C. §2000e et seq.; 42 U.S.C. §12101 et seq.; and 42 U.S.C. §1981a. The complaint alleges disability discrimination and r...
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: September 04, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT/ DEFAULT ENTERED 11/20/15
Date: November 19, 2015MOTION FOR A STAY
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTIFICATION OF SEAL AND STAY BY THE ELEVENTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | ELEVENTH CIRCUIT TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | CLARIFICATION FOR THE COURT | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | SENT TO LAW CLERK FOR REVIEW | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY | |
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ELEVENTH CIRCUIT TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/22/2020 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge WADE MERCER presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.