Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Thakkar, Raj Shitalkumar, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AD867AE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $238.00 RECEIPT #2021029997 | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD867AE | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008181 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 9/17/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 9/17/2021 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD867AE | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | OUT OF STATE DL RECORD | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE UPDATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 10/10/2021 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AD867AE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H JUDGE SEQ: 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.