Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Smikle, Marvin Exdol, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION AD7WFPE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 09/05/2021
Date: September 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AD7WFPE | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD7WFPE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AD7WFPE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AD7WFPE | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: DISMISSED. ATTY ALFORD PRESENT. | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED SEQ: 1 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA SERVED - FROM COURT LIASION PBSO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.