Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Belson, Angela C, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A8NZNXE | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A8NZNXE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $113.00 RECEIPT #2021031907 | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER WITH RETURNED PERSONAL CHECK | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED CHECK | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/07/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008172 A | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 10/06/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.