Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Brewster, Eric John Jr, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008153 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 9/30/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 9/30/2021 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A3KXDRP | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $145.00 RECEIPT #2021031478 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A3KXDRP | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION A3KXDRP FILED, OFFENSE DATE 08/31/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008153 A | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 09/30/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.