Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Hayden, Jacqui, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJGE | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $113.00 RECEIPT #2021029863 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008142 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 9/16/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 9/16/2021 | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJGE | |
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ACXVJGE | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 10/02/2021 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/03/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008142 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.