Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Parker, Aaliyah Ann, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEJK84E | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEJK84E | |
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008103 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 10/2/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 10/2/2021 | |
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $148.00 RECEIPT #2021031680 | |
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF GUILTY SEQ 1 | |
October 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 008103 A | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 30 DAYS TO PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 09/29/2021 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEJK84E |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.