Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Street, Michael James, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $120.00 RECEIPT #2022007310 | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESRHE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEESRHE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 02/13/2022 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 008042 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 12/15/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 12/15/2021 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE SEQ 1 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC: ADJ/G; DEF MUST PAY $25 FINE; $88 CC; $7 SUBPOENA FEE BY 02/13/2022. ATTY ALFORD PRESENT FOR ATTY SMITH. | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.