Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Harries, Robert I, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $338.00 RECEIPT #2021016723 | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACIYNRE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACIYNRE | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 06/10/2021 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | GUILTY SEQ: 1 | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER: THE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO WITHHOLD ADJUDICATION IS HEREBY DENIED. HOWEVER, THE COURT WILL ADJUDICATE THE DEFENDANT OF THE CHARGE OF SPEEDING - 30 MPH OVER WITHOUT WORKERS PRESENT AND ASSESS THE MINIMUM FINE WHICH IS $250.00 AND COURT COSTS OF $88.00 FOR A TOTAL OF $338.00. THE DEFENDANT MUST PAY THE TOTAL AMOUNT DUE WITHIN THIRTY DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DL RECORD - PENNSYLVANIA | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.