Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Corper, Charles Hudson, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACIYO0E | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACIYO0E | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUSPENSION BLOCKED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $59.00 RECEIPT #2021029028 | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF CAN PAY $59.00 AS A GENERAL PAYMENT WITH NCOURT | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 08/18/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $59.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF DID NOT ATTEND DDS;WILL RECEIVE PTS FOR THIS CITATION | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC SCHOOL ELECTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.