Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Banks, Laine Alexandra, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACDWLOE | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACDWLOE | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CLEARANCE LETTER & FAX CONFIRMATION | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $176.80 RECEIPT #2021031771 | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO GILA CORP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $176.80 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 05/24/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $113.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.