Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Barone, Samantha Joanna Christine, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
CITATION AEESD4E FILED, OFFENSE DATE 04/17/2021
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESD4E | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - AEESD4E | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT CLEARED; NOT REINSTATED | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $174.70 RECEIPT #2022002857 | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AEESD4E | |
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLETION CERTIFICATE-DRIVING SCHOOL | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $175.00 RECEIPT #2022001030 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PAID FINE SEQ: 1 | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $349.70 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.