Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Carilus, Marie R, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADKMRSE | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | REINSTATED DL | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADKMRSE | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $150.27 RECEIPT #2021033746 | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REPORTED TO LINEBARGER GOGGAN BLAIR & SAMPSON, LLP FOR COLLECTIONS, NEW TOTAL DUE $89.70 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 05/27/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $69.44 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF DID NOT ATTEND DDS;WILL RECEIVE PTS FOR THIS CITATION | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 90 DAYS TO COMPLETE SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 05/20/2021 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.