Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Maxime, Jenniffer Whitney, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
COURT RECEIPT
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2021025715 | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 07/12/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $270.00 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ACUTWDE | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ACUTWDE | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT RECEIPT | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ADJ W/H JUDGE SEQ: 1 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CHARGE CNT 1 SENTENCING NOTES: PNC: ADJ/W; DEF MUST PAY $175 FINE; $88 CC; $7 SUBPOENA FEE BY 07/04/2021. ATTY GILES PRESENT FOR ATTY GROSSMAN. | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE# 2021 TR 000650 A - SENTENCE IMPOSED: 5/5/2021 EFFECTIVE DATE: 5/5/2021 | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.