Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case against Todd, Ariana Brelyn, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADKMTKE | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADKMTKE | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | SUSPENSION BLOCKED | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $51.80 RECEIPT #2021017630 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTES ADVISE TO MAKE A GENERAL PAYMENT $51.80 | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DEF DID NOT ATTEND DDS;WILL RECEIVE PTS FOR THIS CITATION | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 05/13/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - FAILED TO PAY $51.80 ADDITIONAL CLEARANCE FEE DUE | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : 90 DAYS TO COMPLETE SCHOOL REQUIRED BY: 05/05/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.