Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by De Jesus, John B, against Arizruiz, Leonardo, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $501 - $2500 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
This complaint is filed in the County Court in Indian River County, Florida. The plaintiff, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, is suing the defendant, Leonardo Arizruiz, for damages less than $8,000. The complaint states that the defendant obtained ...
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: May 10, 2022STIPULATION
Date: September 23, 2021PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021028948
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ***PTC PLF- P DEF- P STIPULATION*** | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE (LEONARDO ARIZRUIZ SVD: 9/13/2021) | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021028948 | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: LEONARDO ARIZRUIZ | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: DE JESUS, JOHN B ASSIGNED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/23/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.