Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Charlet, Christina N, against Timmerman, Heather M, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $2501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: September 07, 2022ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - Recorded (OR.3431.2499. / 3120210042104)
Date: June 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (HEATHER M TIMMERMAN SVD: 4/29/21)
Date: May 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION - Recorded (OR.3431.2499. / 3120210042104) | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - Recorded (OR.3431.402. / 3120210041490) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - Recorded (OR.3422.1291. / 3120210035310) | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ****PTC PLF-P DEF-P STIPULATION**** | |
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (HEATHER M TIMMERMAN SVD: 4/29/21) | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021013581 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.