Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Green, Johan A, against Morin, George, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims $2501 - $5000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS
Date: February 26, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE ( GEORGE MORIN) SVD: 1/26/2021
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.3393.697. / 3120210013979) | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COURT COSTS | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT GARRET RODEN | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ***PTC PLF-P DEF-NP ATTY TO PREPARE DFJ**** | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE INDIAN RIVER COUNTY ( PLAINTIFF) | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ( GEORGE MORIN) SVD: 1/26/2021 | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.