Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Davis, Johnny James, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM000527AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EFNOINFO-5/7/2021 | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION - Recorded (OR.3419.1207. / 3120210033027) | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST SEQ: 1 - (843.02) RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE ; ROR | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 05/11/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST AFFIDAVIT | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 04/19/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 MM 000527 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.