Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Nestor, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE TO APPEAR
Date: January 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI - Recorded (OR.3433.620. / 3120210043015) | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2021009896 | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFERRED PROSECUTION AGREEMENT | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : FINES AND/OR COURT COSTS REQUIRED BY: 03/27/2021 | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI; DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO CHRZAN, ADAM RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021MM000075AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TNOH-2/8/2021 | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 03/09/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.