Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Traina, Joseph P, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MENZ, NICOLE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMENZ, NICOLE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryNon Criminal Infractions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | OFFICER DISMISSAL FORM | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED SEQ: 1 | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF SEQ 1 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA SERVED | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | INFRACTION COURT SET FOR 06/30/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 3/ , JDG: MENZ, NICOLE | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA SERVED | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021IN000533AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: TSUBP-4/29/2021 | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | TRF SUBPOENA ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.