Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Zickert, Martin J, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration, Including Ancillary, Curatorship And Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.3612.2442. / 3120230017710) | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISCHARGE - RECORDED (OR.3604.928. / 3120230010541) | |
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO EMMONS, REBECCA F RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CP001082XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: STATE-11/2/2021 ***STATEMENT OF CLAIM - FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY EMAILED*** |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.