Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brown, Thomas, Brown Trustee, Thomas, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with MEADOWS, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMEADOWS, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration, Estate $1000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED (OR.3572.1125. / 3120220057803) | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - RECORDED (OR.3572.1109. / 3120220057795) | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF FORMAL NOTICE AND PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO BARNES, LISA THOMPSON RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CP001080XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: STATE-10/6/2021 ***STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION SIGNED BY CLERK ON 10/6/21***CS | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION ***SIGNED BY CLERK ON 10/6/21***CS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.