Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Robb, Daniel Joseph, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryFormal Administration, Including Ancillary, Curatorship And Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 11/09/2023 AT 1:30 PM IN 8/ , JDG: GRIFFIN, VICTORIA L | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION NOTICE OF HEARING AND SELF EXECUTING ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 28, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO MCHUGH, JOHN JOSEPH JR RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CP001070XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: STATE-11/15/2021 ***STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY BANK OF AMERICA NA*** | |
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.3484.2146. / 3120210079974) | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY BANK OF AMERICA NA ***SIGNED BY CLERK 11/17/21***CS | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.3482.1561. / 3120210078427) | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.3482.1571. / 3120210078432) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.