Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Cobb, Jeremy Dominique, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with VAUGHN, DAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVAUGHN, DAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
DEFENSE COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: April 26, 2022INFORMATION (EFILE)
Date: October 07, 2021DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI; DEMAND FOR RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY; STATE'S DISCOVERY EXHIBIT
Date: December 21, 2021DETERMINATION OF INDIGENT STATUS
Date: May 02, 2022ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 03, 2021LIVE WARRANT ISSUED:
Date: September 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOLLE PROSEQUI | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AS30K177438 (893.13 1E1 F F 3552) RELEASED | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - AEETE5E | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AS6K808793 (893.13 6A F T 3532) RELEASED | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CF001020AXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: NOLLE-12/19/2022 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS APPEARANCE WAIVED FOR DOCKET CALL, DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE GRANTED, SET FOR 1/18 @ 9 AM | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | PRIVATE ATTORNEY DOCKET CALL SET FOR 01/18/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 5/ , JDG: MEADOWS, ROBERT | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENSE MOTION TO DISCLOSE THE IDENTITY OF THE CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.