Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brewer, Sherry, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Sturgis, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryEviction Non-Monetary (Count I) - Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
This complaint is an action to evict the defendant, Thomas Sturgis, from a property located at 420 11th St SW, Vero Beach, FL 32962. The plaintiff, Sherry Brewer, is the owner of the property. The defendant is in possession of the property under an o...
COMPLAINT (COUNT I)
Date: September 02, 2021PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2021028565
Date: September 02, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 02, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED: THOMAS STURGIS***5 DAYS***
Date: September 03, 2021EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (THOMAS STURGIS) ***ATTACHED MEDIATION PROGRAM FLYER***
Date: September 03, 2021MOTION, NOTICE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3513.1381. / 3120220011094)
Date: January 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTIONS SET FOR 02/17/2022 AT 2:30 PM IN 2/ , JDG: STONE, ROBYN E. | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION, NOTICE, AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL - RECORDED (OR.3513.1381. / 3120220011094) | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED: THOMAS STURGIS***5 DAYS*** | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY: PRO SE ASSIGNED | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS STATUS CHANGED TO PENDING SUMMONS | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | EVICTION CERTIFICATE OF MAILING (THOMAS STURGIS) ***ATTACHED MEDIATION PROGRAM FLYER*** | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ***SUM'S W/ EVICTION MEDIATION PROGRAM FLYER TO IRCSO - PLF PREPAID*** | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT (COUNT I) | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2021028565 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.