Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) County Civil $15,0001 - $30,000 case represented by Charlet, Christina N, against Delancey, James, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with STONE, ROBYN E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTONE, ROBYN E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Civil $15,0001 - $30,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
|
This complaint was filed by Goldman Sachs Bank USA against James Delancey in the County Court of Indian River County, Florida. The plaintiff, Goldman Sachs Bank USA, is a New York State-chartered bank and member of the FDIC. The defendant, James Dela...
STIPULATION
Date: December 21, 2021FIRST RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS BY PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER ( JAMES DELANCEY) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.