Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Malvicini, Cynthia F, Malvicini, Peter G, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Kretschmer, Fred L Jr, against Thompson, Lester M, in the jurisdiction of Indian River County. This case was filed in Indian River County Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCROOM, JANET C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther-Business Transactions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationIndian River County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 19, 2021EXECUTION **ISSUED 5/12/21**
Date: April 29, 2021WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED (GARN: CHASE BANK)
Date: July 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE AND DEMAND TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES (GARN: JPMORGAN CASE BANK NA) | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED TO CHASE BANK | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2021023260 | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO KRETSCHMER, FRED L JR RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CA000028XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: WRITGARN-7/12/2021 ***WRIT OF GARNISHMENT W/NOT TO DEF AND CLAIM OF EXEMPTION EMAILED***TS | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED (GARN: CHASE BANK) | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT AFTER JUDGMENT (CHASE BANK) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | EMAIL SENT TO KRETSCHMER, FRED L JR RE SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – CASE NUMBER 312021CA000028XXXXXX WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS: EXECUTION-4/29/2021 ***EXECUTION FOR LESTER M THOMPSON A/K/A LESTER MCARTHUR THOMPSON*** | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event | EXECUTION **ISSUED 5/12/21** | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' CERTIFICATION OF MAILING DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.