Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Curry, Natalie Rachal, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Curry, Donald Allen, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with ROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERTS, RUSSELL STERLING Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF CONTEMPT | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENT RECEIPT | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event CHILD SUPPORT on 12/2/2022 0945 AM Judge JACQUELINE SMITH results Continued on 11/3/2022 | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 12/1/2022 at 0945 AM, MX - Judge JACQUELINE SMITH presiding. | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Event Type changed to DOR Child Support Hearings for 12/1/2022 at 0945 AM | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTEMPT NOTICE TO PRODUCE NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.