Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gilroy, Kimberly, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gilroy, Rich, in the jurisdiction of Holmes County, FL, . Holmes County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHolmes County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to Closed | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR RICH GILROY SERVED 01/06/2021 | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PARENTING PLAN (SIGNED BY RESPONDENT) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT AS TO RESPONDENT | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (SIGNED BY RESPONDENT) | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE AS TO RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.