Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schumacher, Jereme, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gonzalez , Robert Francis, against Heritage Property & Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Ferreira , Priscila Burger, Thornton , Marianne Norma, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Polo, Melissa. M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePolo, Melissa. M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;1820;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/Dc208Ae6-C1Fe-46Fc-B2B9-F7D64Eaa5484/Results/456D4C0A-5D18-4E24-B369-688323C2A912/Lines/1Fffe650-E179-48E7-B21A-D4F6166C46C2/Disposition_Html |
MOTION TO - FOR
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL
Date: January 26, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT
Date: April 05, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING
Date: March 30, 2023NOTICE
Date: May 19, 2023NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: July 06, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 30, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 25, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 13, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 13, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: November 29, 2022ADDITIONAL LIST OF WITNESSES
Date: January 09, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 17, 2023AGREED ORDER
Date: February 02, 2023DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER BY COURT
Date: May 26, 2022AMENDED WITNESS LIST
Date: November 11, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: October 06, 2022DISCLOSURE
Date: September 02, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 02, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED
Date: September 21, 2022AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: May 20, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: April 25, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION WITH SUBPOENAS ATTACHED
Date: April 07, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 25, 2022JOINT STIPULATION
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: April 12, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 12, 2022SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: October 28, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: October 27, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: April 26, 2022REPORT
Date: August 31, 2022SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE
Date: November 29, 2022NOTICE
Date: December 27, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 20, 2022SUBPOENA - DUCES TECUM
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: September 23, 2021ORDER
Date: March 09, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: September 14, 2021SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: October 10, 2022PRIVILEGE LOG
Date: September 15, 2021SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION
Date: September 16, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 25, 2022NOTICE
Date: September 14, 2021DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: June 30, 2021NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 02, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 09, 2022E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: July 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 11, 2021General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: July 01, 2021DISCLOSURE
Date: August 01, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: April 26, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 25, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LEAD ATTORNEY
Date: December 14, 2021MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION
Date: December 27, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 11, 2021RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: September 15, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 11, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2021E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 30, 2021REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM March 30th, 2023 at 9:30AM |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ATTEND NON-BINDING ARBITRATION VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-BINDING ARBITRATION |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND JURY TRIAL JT 01/08/24 AT 9:00 AM, PTC 12/07/23 AT 1:30 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.