Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Napoli, Lorraine L, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Peacock, A. Emily presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeacock, A. Emily Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LORRAINE L. NAPOLI, 2/9/19 |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - BSERRANO@ANDREUPALMA |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.