Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Synergy Contracting Group, Inc., filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Battisti , Steven Italo, against Florida Peninsula Insurance Company, represented by Velazco , Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Peacock, A. Emily presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeacock, A. Emily Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PLT - DEPOSITIONS |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.