Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Perez , J L, Tunick , Rachel, against Shaulis, Timothy James, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeFile:Text/Plain;2265;Accounts/Ae561E02-9985-4563-B637-688249A9Fec1/Robots/3Af7C482-0964-4Df2-B4E4-D5E8Befe8E9E/Runs/Cs-5F338Ca3442E7B5D13E4475Dd79Ff8Fd/Executions/575C8Bd0-D937-42F1-B50F-69Ed930E7972/Results/8A0Bbe2D-E7Ee-4423-B6F0-B4Aab8E6754C/Lines/62Fedb7E-Fbfb-4B31-Bafd-Dc959E9Fc742/Disposition_Html |
NOTICE TO DEFENDANT
Date: December 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Date: January 18, 2023ORDER CANCELLING HEARING
Date: August 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SATISFACTION OF FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED GARNISHEE: BANK OF AMERICA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O C T CORPORATION SYSTEM- 12/14/2022 |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.