Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jd Restoration Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Nielsen, A. Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNielsen, A. Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryContract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY | |
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.