Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hillsborough County, filed a(n) Other case against The Estate Of Carolyn Y Johnson, The Unknown Beneficiaries Of The Estate Of Carolyn Y Johnson, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL, . Hillsborough County, FL Superior Courts with Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBattles, L. Emmett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationHillsborough County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE FROM $400 TO $905 | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | $70.00 ELECTRONIC JUDICIAL SALE FEE DUE | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
FEE LETTER SENT JUDICIAL SALE FEE |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT PLNTFF'S |
|
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLNTFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF CODE ENFORCEMENT LIENS MADE IN SUPPORT OF THE PLNTFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- ATTACHED |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING NAMED PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.